Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4230 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17636 Week
» 70652 Month
» 190179 Year
» 3217032 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1648 |
on |
18/05/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
16xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
389 |
To Service |
Fri 18/05/1951 to Swindon (82C) |
Withdrawal |
Fri 17/05/1963 |
Service Life |
11 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys |
Total Mileage |
200,010 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
82C |
Swindon |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
87C |
Danygraig |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
ALLOC |
87G |
Carmarthen |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
87H |
Neyland |
4w/e |
10/09/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
01/06/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/05/1951 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1648 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
17/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1648 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|