Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4215 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13789 Week
» 78743 Month
» 281407 Year
» 3308260 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1650 |
09/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47066 |
01/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47661 |
12/12/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47816 |
23/02/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/01/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1979 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
09/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/01/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
01/1979 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1650 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
30/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47066 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/12/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47661 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
23/02/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47816 |
|
|