Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1563 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19366 Week
» 72382 Month
» 191909 Year
» 3218762 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1653 |
16/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47069 |
01/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47638 |
12/02/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47845 |
24/11/1989 |
|
TOPS (57/3) |
57301 |
31/05/2002 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/01/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/01/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1653 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47069 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/02/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47638 |
|
|
24/11/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47845 |
|
|
31/05/2002 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57301 |
|
|