Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 778 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18581 Week
» 71597 Month
» 191124 Year
» 3217977 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1654 |
on |
22/12/1954 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
16xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
417 |
To Service |
Mon 22/12/1954 to Llanelli (87F) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1964 |
Service Life |
9 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
81C |
Southall |
4w/e |
11/08/1962 |
ALLOC |
81B |
Slough |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
TOSTORE |
81F |
Oxford |
2w/e |
16/05/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/06/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1954 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1654 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
11/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
15/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1654 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|