Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 735 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14141 Week
» 67157 Month
» 186684 Year
» 3213537 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1655 |
30/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47071 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47536 |
10/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
30/01/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/01/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1655 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47071 but not taken up |
|
|
10/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47536 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/11/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47536 |
|
|
10/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|