Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1906 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19709 Week
» 72725 Month
» 192252 Year
» 3219105 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1658 |
on |
28/02/1955 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
16xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
417 |
To Service |
Fri 28/02/1955 to Swindon (82C) |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/11/1964 |
Service Life |
9 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
82C |
|
Swindon (New) |
on |
28/02/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/11/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
28/02/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/12/1964 |
Swindon MPD (Stored) |
D9516/7 and 23 other Diesels with 48479 the only steam loco. Stored: 1011, 1658/64, 4903/32, 6122, 6430, 73012. |
SLS/196502 |
14/02/1965 |
Swindon Shed (Stored) |
Ex Works: D820, D3039, D3745. Waiting works: D3749. Derelict: 73012. Stored: 1011, 1658/64, 6430. |
SLS/196503 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/02/1955 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1658 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
06/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1658 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|