Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1992 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15398 Week
» 68414 Month
» 187941 Year
» 3214794 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1659 |
06/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47075 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47645 |
21/03/1986 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
06/02/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/02/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
03/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1659 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47075 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
01/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
03/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
21/03/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47645 |
|
|
01/02/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47645 |
|
|
04/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|