Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 457 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18260 Week
» 71276 Month
» 190803 Year
» 3217656 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D166 |
09/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46029 |
05/10/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
09/05/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
30/01/1983 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys |
Cut Up |
30/09/1986 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/10/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/10/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D166 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
20/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
05/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46029 |
|
|
30/01/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46029 |
|
|
30/09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|