Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1845 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19648 Week
» 72664 Month
» 192191 Year
» 3219044 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1660 |
13/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47076 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47625 |
22/11/1984 |
|
TOPS (47/7b) |
47749 |
11/1995 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/02/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/02/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1660 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Naming |
Named 'CITY OF TRURO' by Dr Mabel Andrews, Mayor of Truro at Truro station |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47076 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
22/11/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47625 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/1995 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47749 |
|
|