Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 386 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 1258 Week
» 13036 Month
» 302428 Year
» 813530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1661 13/02/1965
TOPS (1973) 47077 02/1974
TOPS (ETH) 47613 05/1984

Names Carried
Name Date From
NORTH STAR 20/03/1965

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 13/02/1965
Withdrawn 01/05/2007
Time in Service 42 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87E Landore (New) 13/02/1965
OC   w/e 28/04/1973
CF Cardiff Canton 3w/e 09/10/1976
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 01/05/2007

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/02/1965 To Service To service as D1661
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Landore (87E)
   
20/03/1965 Naming Named 'NORTH STAR' by Ray Gunter, Minister of Labour at Paddington Station    
29/06/1969 Sightings Old Oak Common depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
28/04/1973 Allocation      
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47077    
05/1976 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
09/10/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF)    
05/1984 Renumbered Renumbered to 47613    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
01/05/2007 Withdrawn Condemned as 47613    

prev prev