Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 201 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1946 Week
» 10688 Month
» 354867 Year
» 865969 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1662 20/02/1965
TOPS (1973) 47484 08/12/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL 20/03/1965

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 20/02/1965
Withdrawn 01/06/1998
Time in Service 33 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87E Landore (New) 20/02/1965
86A Cardiff Canton 5w/e 27/03/1966
87E Landore 10w/e 28/08/1966
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 08/12/1973
LE Landore w/e 11/05/1974
   Withdrawn 01/06/1998

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/02/1965 To Service To service as D1662
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Landore (87E)
   
20/03/1965 Naming Named 'ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL' by Cllr K Dalby, Lord Mayor of Bristol at Bristol Temple Meads station    
27/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
28/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 47484    
08/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LE)    
01/06/1998 Withdrawn Condemned as 47484    

prev prev