Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 724 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5298 Week
» 33256 Month
» 67898 Year
» 1289463 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 1669   31/05/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 16xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 31/05/1955 to St Philips Marsh (82B)
Withdrawal During 10/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 10 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82B St Philips Marsh (New) 31/05/1955
84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 01/11/1958
81C Southall 4w/e 30/01/1960
87H Neyland 4w/e 13/08/1960
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 24/02/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 2w/e 17/11/1962
87F Llanelly 5w/e 24/08/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 82B St Philips Marsh m/e 31/05/1955
ALLOC 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 3w/e 10/08/1964
WDN   01/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1955 To Service To service as GWR Number 1669
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)
   
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 1669    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev