Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3744 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22655 Week
» 87609 Month
» 290273 Year
» 3317126 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1680 |
11/05/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47094 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
11/05/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
01/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/05/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
01/1976 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/05/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1680 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47094 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
24/02/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47094 |
|
|
05/12/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|