Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 4356 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19968 Week
» 118613 Month
» 321277 Year
» 3348130 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D169 |
07/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46032 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
07/06/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
11/10/1981 off Gateshead (GD) |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
on 20/07/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and white bodyside band at base of body. |
07/06/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
19/12/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
19/12/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D169 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46032 |
|
|
11/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46032 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
20/07/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|