Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3931 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17337 Week
» 70353 Month
» 189880 Year
» 3216733 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1692 |
30/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47104 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
30/11/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
02/12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1692 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 454 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
27/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47104 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
24/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
14/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
05/05/1988 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/05/1988 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
10/06/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47104 |
|
|
22/10/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|