Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 182 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17985 Week
» 71001 Month
» 190528 Year
» 3217381 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1696 |
12/12/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47108 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/12/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/12/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
07/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1696 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 458 Allocated to Derby (16C) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
09/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47108 |
|
|
07/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
17/03/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47108 |
|
|
05/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|