Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 728 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14134 Week
» 67150 Month
» 186677 Year
» 3213530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1699 |
28/12/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47111 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/12/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
23/09/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 01/1979 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/12/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
23/09/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 01/1979 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/04/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1699 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 461 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
23/09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47111 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
24/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
05/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
28/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47111 |
|
|
03/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Cardiff Canton MPD |
|
|