Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 338 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18141 Week
» 71157 Month
» 190684 Year
» 3217537 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1702 |
04/11/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47114 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
04/11/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
23/12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
23/12/1969 |
|
Reclassified from 48 to 47 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/11/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
23/12/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/11/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1702 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 464 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
23/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 48 to 47 |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47114 |
|
|
30/09/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47114 |
|
|
14/03/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|