Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 662 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14068 Week
» 67084 Month
» 186611 Year
» 3213464 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1713 |
28/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47488 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
475 |
To Service |
28/01/1964 to Oxley (2B) |
Withdrawn |
30/06/2008 |
Time in Service |
44 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/01/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
07/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
02/1974 |
ve |
Vacuum brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
07/1976 |
ve |
Vacuum brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1713 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 475 Allocated to Oxley (2B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47488 |
|
|
07/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
30/06/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47488 |
|
|