Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1057 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18860 Week
» 71876 Month
» 191403 Year
» 3218256 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1714 |
01/02/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47124 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
01/02/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/06/1973 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/02/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
02/06/1973 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 12/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
11/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/02/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1714 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 476 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47124 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/06/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47124 |
|
|
24/10/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|