Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1550 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14956 Week
» 67972 Month
» 187499 Year
» 3214352 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1717 |
28/02/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47126 |
26/01/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47555 |
28/09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/02/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
01/1979 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/02/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
09/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
WR ATC |
|
|
01/1979 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/02/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1717 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 479 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
01/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47126 |
|
|
15/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
28/09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47555 |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
01/01/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47555 |
|
|
10/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|