Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1188 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15231 Week
» 80185 Month
» 282849 Year
» 3309702 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1720 |
06/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47129 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47658 |
30/10/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47813 |
23/07/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
06/03/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1978 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
05/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 10/1978 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 07/1982 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1720 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 482 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47129 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
05/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
10/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/10/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47658 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
23/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47813 |
|
|