Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 14 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6860 Week
» 18407 Month
» 418089 Year
» 494676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1725 24/03/1964
TOPS (1973) 47490 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 487
To Service 24/03/1964
Withdrawn 01/07/2000
Time in Service 36 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys
Information Carried worksplate '496' but on paper it was '487'
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82A Bristol Bath Road (New) 24/03/1964
WL Western Lines (LMR) w/e 11/03/1967
91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/03/1967
D02 Birmingham Division 17/06/1968
CD Crewe Diesel 3w/e 08/05/1976
   Withdrawn 01/07/2000

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/03/1964 To Service To service as D1725
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 487
Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)
   
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
31/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47490    
08/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
09/1976 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
01/07/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 47490    

prev prev