Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 510 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18313 Week
» 71329 Month
» 190856 Year
» 3217709 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1738 |
28/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47145 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/05/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 10/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 10/1977 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
vbh |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1738 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 500 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47145 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
01/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47145 |
|
|
08/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|