Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1394 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19197 Week
» 72213 Month
» 191740 Year
» 3218593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1742 |
29/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47149 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47617 |
24/07/1984 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/05/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1742 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 504 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47149 |
|
|
05/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
03/03/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
24/07/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47617 |
|
|
01/01/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47617 |
|
|
02/1998 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|