Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1283 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19086 Week
» 72102 Month
» 191629 Year
» 3218482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1747 |
03/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47154 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47546 |
11/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
03/07/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 02/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
11/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1747 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 509 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
20/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47154 but not taken up |
|
|
24/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47546 |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/06/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47546 |
|
|
04/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|