Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3599 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17005 Week
» 70021 Month
» 189548 Year
» 3216401 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1749 |
10/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47156 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
10/07/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1749 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 511 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SX) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47156 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
31/01/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47156 |
|
|
03/03/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|