Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 537 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18340 Week
» 71356 Month
» 190883 Year
» 3217736 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1751 |
14/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47158 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47634 |
21/12/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/07/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1751 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 513 Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
18/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47158 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
21/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47634 |
|
|
01/03/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47634 |
|
|
10/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|