Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 792 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2700 Week
» 18898 Month
» 183798 Year
» 694900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1755 14/08/1964
TOPS (1973) 47161
TOPS (ETH) 47541 09/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 517
To Service 14/08/1964
Withdrawn 01/02/2004
Time in Service 39 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys
Information Carried worksplate '483' but on paper it was '517'
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87E Landore (New) 14/08/1964
86A Cardiff Canton 2w/e 07/03/1965
87E Landore q/e 15/01/1967
D05 Stoke Division w/e 22/06/1968
91M To London Midland Region 7w/e 27/07/1968
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 08/02/1969
D05 Stoke Division w/e 06/12/1969
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 20/12/1969
D05 Stoke Division w/e 11/07/1970
86A Cardiff Canton w/e 09/10/1971
91E To Eastern Region 2w/e 12/10/1974
YK York (North) 2w/e 30/11/1974
   Withdrawn 01/02/2004

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/08/1964 To Service To service as D1755
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 517
Allocated to Landore (87E)
   
07/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
15/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
22/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
08/02/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
06/12/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
20/12/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
10/1971 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
09/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47541    
12/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
30/11/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
01/02/2004 Withdrawn Condemned as 47541    

prev prev