Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 588 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13994 Week
» 67010 Month
» 186537 Year
» 3213390 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1761 |
01/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47166 |
10/10/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47611 |
10/05/1984 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47837 |
20/10/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
01/09/1964 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/09/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1761 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 523 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
10/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47166 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
15/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
10/05/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47611 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
20/10/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47837 |
|
|
01/11/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47837 |
|
|
07/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|