Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 910 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6515 Week
» 18062 Month
» 417744 Year
» 494331 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1762 01/09/1964
TOPS (1973) 47167 22/12/1973
TOPS (ETH) 47580 05/1980

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 524
To Service 01/09/1964
Withdrawn 01/04/2004
Time in Service 39 yrs , 7 mths
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Tinsley (New) 01/09/1964
31B March w/e 09/01/1965
40B Immingham w/e 09/09/1967
34G Finsbury Park w/e 12/10/1968
30A Stratford 2w/e 10/03/1973
FP Finsbury Park w/e 19/05/1973
IM Immingham w/e 11/08/1973
TI Tinsley w/e 11/05/1974
SF Stratford 3w/e 10/05/1975
TI Tinsley 3w/e 02/05/1976
   Withdrawn 01/04/2004

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/09/1964 To Service To service as D1762
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 524
Allocated to Tinsley (41A)
   
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Finsbury Park depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
10/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
11/08/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 47167    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
05/1980 Renumbered Renumbered to 47580    
01/04/2004 Withdrawn Condemned as 47580    

prev prev