Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1288 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14694 Week
» 67710 Month
» 187237 Year
» 3214090 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1764 |
08/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47169 |
02/02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47581 |
31/12/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
08/09/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 01/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/09/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1764 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 526 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47169 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
07/03/1979 |
Naming |
Named 'GREAT EASTERN' by Sir Kenneth Cork, Lord Mayor of London at Liverpool Street Station |
|
|
31/12/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47581 |
|
|
01/11/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47581 |
|
|
09/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers: at Motherwell MPD |
|
|