Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1822 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15228 Week
» 68244 Month
» 187771 Year
» 3214624 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1766 |
22/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47171 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47592 |
12/08/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/09/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/09/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1766 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 528 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
21/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47171 |
|
|
30/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/08/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47592 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/12/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47592 |
|
|
03/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by S Norton: Liverpool |
|
|