Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1691 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19494 Week
» 72510 Month
» 192037 Year
» 3218890 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1768 |
30/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47173 |
26/01/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47573 |
31/12/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
30/10/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1986 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1768 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 530 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
24/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
18/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
21/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47173 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
31/12/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47573 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
01/05/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47573 |
|
|
10/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|