Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 95 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17898 Week
» 70914 Month
» 190441 Year
» 3217294 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1769 |
22/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47174 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47574 |
04/01/1981 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/10/1964 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1769 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 531 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47174 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/01/1981 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47574 |
|
|
06/09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/12/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47574 |
|
|
06/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|