Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1056 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18859 Week
» 71875 Month
» 191402 Year
» 3218255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1770 |
05/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47175 |
02/02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47575 |
08/03/1981 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
05/10/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1770 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 532 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47175 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
08/03/1981 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47575 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|