Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17805 Week
» 70821 Month
» 190348 Year
» 3217201 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1771 |
14/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47176 |
24/08/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47576 |
29/06/1980 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/10/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1986 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1771 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 533 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
14/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
24/08/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47176 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
29/06/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47576 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
01/11/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47576 |
|
|
11/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|