Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 578 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13984 Week
» 67000 Month
» 186527 Year
» 3213380 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1774 |
19/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47179 |
07/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47577 |
29/03/1981 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47847 |
19/12/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
19/10/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
12/02/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Not known |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1774 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 536 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47179 |
|
|
01/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (KY) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
29/03/1981 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47577 |
|
|
19/12/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47847 |
|
|