Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1040 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18843 Week
» 71859 Month
» 191386 Year
» 3218239 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1777 |
06/11/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47182 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47598 |
17/12/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
06/11/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/11/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/11/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1777 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 539 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47182 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
17/12/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47598 |
|
|
01/11/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47598 |
|
|
05/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|