Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3377 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16783 Week
» 69799 Month
» 189326 Year
» 3216179 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1782 |
14/11/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47301 |
12/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/11/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/11/1964 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/11/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1782 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 544 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
23/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (55G) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47301 |
|
|
06/09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
31/01/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47301 |
|
|
02/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by R Garrett: at Crewe Basford Hall |
|
|