Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1405 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19208 Week
» 72224 Month
» 191751 Year
» 3218604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1783 |
14/11/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47302 |
02/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/11/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/11/1964 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/11/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1783 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 545 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (55G) |
|
|
02/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47302 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47302 |
|
|
08/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|