Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1392 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14798 Week
» 67814 Month
» 187341 Year
» 3214194 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1791 |
10/12/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47310 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
10/12/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/12/1964 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/12/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1791 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 553 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (55G) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47310 |
|
|
28/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47310 |
|
|
30/04/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|