Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3475 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16881 Week
» 69897 Month
» 189424 Year
» 3216277 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1800 |
14/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47319 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/01/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/01/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1800 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 562 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47319 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (KY) |
|
|
05/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Raxstar: at Immingham MPD |
|
|
14/07/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47319 |
|
|