Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 798 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18601 Week
» 71617 Month
» 191144 Year
» 3217997 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1803 |
21/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47322 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (57/0) |
57002 |
23/11/1998 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
21/01/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
12/1983 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1983 |
|
Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/01/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
12/1983 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1803 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 565 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47322 |
|
|
12/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
12/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
23/11/1998 |
Naming |
Named 'Freightliner Phoenix' |
|
|
23/11/1998 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57002 |
|
|