Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 170 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17973 Week
» 70989 Month
» 190516 Year
» 3217369 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1808 |
30/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47327 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
30/01/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/01/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/01/1970 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1808 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 570 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47327 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
19/02/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47327 |
|
|
12/11/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|