Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4196 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17602 Week
» 70618 Month
» 190145 Year
» 3216998 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1810 |
09/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47329 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (57/0) |
57011 |
20/02/2000 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/02/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/02/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1810 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 572 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
08/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47329 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
20/02/2000 |
Naming |
Named 'Freightliner Challenger' |
|
|
20/02/2000 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57011 |
|
|