Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1811 |
09/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47330 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (57/3) |
57312 |
31/10/2003 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/02/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/02/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1811 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 573 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47330 |
|
|
31/10/2003 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57312 |
|
|