Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 123 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17926 Week
» 70942 Month
» 190469 Year
» 3217322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1813 |
22/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47332 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (57/0) |
57007 |
28/10/1999 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/02/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/02/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1813 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 575 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47332 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
28/10/1999 |
Naming |
Named 'Freightliner Bond' |
|
|
28/10/1999 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57007 |
|
|