Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1400 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19203 Week
» 72219 Month
» 191746 Year
» 3218599 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1815 |
18/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47334 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
18/02/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/02/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1815 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 577 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47334 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
30/09/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47334 |
|
|
04/01/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|