Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 925 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14331 Week
» 67347 Month
» 186874 Year
» 3213727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1817 |
01/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47336 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
01/03/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/03/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1817 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 579 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47336 |
|
|
28/06/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47336 |
|
|
26/11/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|